WA HB1958 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Accelerating rural job growth and promoting economic recovery across Washington through a shovel-ready site certification program and grants.
Title
Accelerating rural job growth and promoting economic recovery across Washington through a shovel-ready site certification program and grants.
Sponsors
Rep. April Berg [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-04 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 160 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 160 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |