WA HB1958 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of a premobilization aviation assistance program to assist local fire suppression entities on the initial attack of a wildland fire.
Title
Concerning the establishment of a premobilization aviation assistance program to assist local fire suppression entities on the initial attack of a wildland fire.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] |
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-22 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1958&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1958.pdf |