WA HB1957 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing community appeals boards that review licensing decisions of the department of early learning.
Title
Establishing community appeals boards that review licensing decisions of the department of early learning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1957&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1957.pdf |