WA HB1954 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sealing juvenile records under certain conditions.
Title
Sealing juvenile records under certain conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Chapter 236, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-17 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 6. | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-09 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-10 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-26 | APPG - Majority; do pass HS 09 bill proposed by Human Services. | |
2009-02-26 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-02-19 | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |