WA HB1952 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning enforcement of the electrical laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning enforcement of the electrical laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-23HouseChapter 240, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-23HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-28SenateCommittee amendment
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-22SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-01-24SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-01-16SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
2017-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-03HouseFloor amendment
2017-03-03House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-16HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-16HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1952&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1952.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1952-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1952-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1952-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1952-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1952&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1952&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-24-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1952&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1952&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2018

Bill Comments

feedback