WA HB1943 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning home detention. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning electronic monitoring. )
Title
Concerning home detention. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning electronic monitoring. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-18 | House | Chapter 287, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2015-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-23 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-23 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2015-02-20 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |