WA HB1942 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the availability of sexual assault nurse examiner education in rural and underserved areas.
Title
Increasing the availability of sexual assault nurse examiner education in rural and underserved areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] |
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1942&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1942.pdf |