WA HB1941 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a simple majority of voters voting to authorize school district bonds at general elections.
Title
Providing for a simple majority of voters voting to authorize school district bonds at general elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1941&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1941.pdf |