WA HB1940 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that school district and educational service district employees' basic benefits be determined and administered by the state health care authority.
Title
Requiring that school district and educational service district employees' basic benefits be determined and administered by the state health care authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Alexander [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] |
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-02 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-03-02 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |