WA HB1930 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child custody.
Title
Concerning child custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:00 PM. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |