WA HB1927 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning government efficiency by eliminating, revising or decodifying obsolete or inactive statutory provisions that concern the office of financial management.
Title
Concerning government efficiency by eliminating, revising or decodifying obsolete or inactive statutory provisions that concern the office of financial management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Same As/Similar To
SB5292 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.