WA HB1924 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the expiration date for the sales and use tax exemption of hog fuel to comply with the 2045 deadline for fossil fuel-free electrical generation in Washington state and to protect jobs with health care and retirement benefits in economically distressed communities.
Title
Changing the expiration date for the sales and use tax exemption of hog fuel to comply with the 2045 deadline for fossil fuel-free electrical generation in Washington state and to protect jobs with health care and retirement benefits in economically distressed communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 08 | 956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |