WA HB1924 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the voting rights of persons convicted of a felony offense.
Title
Concerning the voting rights of persons convicted of a felony offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |