WA HB1919 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recommendations by the public disclosure commission.
Title
Concerning recommendations by the public disclosure commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-31 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 17a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 17a | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 700 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 17a | 785 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |