WA HB1919 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing and responding to animal abuse.
Title
Preventing and responding to animal abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] |
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 174, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |