WA HB1918 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing emissions from outdoor power equipment.
Title
Reducing emissions from outdoor power equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Committee on Finance: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Committee on Finance: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 5:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2022-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 19a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 08 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |