WA HB1917 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the imposition of port district facility entry fees for certain ground transportation service providers.
Title
Concerning the imposition of port district facility entry fees for certain ground transportation service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5739 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.