WA HB1917 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning video and/or sound recordings made by law enforcement or corrections officers.
Title
Concerning video and/or sound recordings made by law enforcement or corrections officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |