WA HB1916 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting crime victims and witnesses by promoting victim-centered, trauma-informed responses in the legal system.
Title
Supporting crime victims and witnesses by promoting victim-centered, trauma-informed responses in the legal system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-01 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 630 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 101 | 270 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 278 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 68 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 69 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |