WA HB1911 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning participating in insurance plans and contracts by separated plan 2 members of certain retirement systems.
Title
Concerning participating in insurance plans and contracts by separated plan 2 members of certain retirement systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |