WA HB1906 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the expansion of counties qualifying for the farm internship program, including certain southwest Washington counties. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Allowing the expansion of counties qualifying for the farm internship program. )

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the expansion of counties qualifying for the farm internship program, including certain southwest Washington counties. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Allowing the expansion of counties qualifying for the farm internship program. )

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-27HouseChapter 150, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-27HouseGovernor signed.
2017-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-19SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-13HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2017-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2017-03-31SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2017-03-31SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-31SenateCommittee amendment
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-03-22SenateCLS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
2017-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-14HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-02HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback