WA HB1905 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing homelessness for youth and young adults discharging from a publicly funded system of care.
Title
Reducing homelessness for youth and young adults discharging from a publicly funded system of care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022*. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 137, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-26 | House | CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 216 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 330 | New Code | See Bill Text |