WA HB1904 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting tenants from excessive rent and related fees by providing at least six months' notice for rent increases over a certain amount, allowing tenants the right to terminate a tenancy, and limiting late fees.
Title
Protecting tenants from excessive rent and related fees by providing at least six months' notice for rent increases over a certain amount, allowing tenants the right to terminate a tenancy, and limiting late fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | HHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 18 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 230 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |