WA HB1901 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the month of September as the month of the kindergartener.
Title
Recognizing the month of September as the month of the kindergartener.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1901&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1901.pdf |