WA HB1898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning middle school career and technical education.
Title
Concerning middle school career and technical education.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1898&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1898.pdf |