WA HB1896 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for responsible environmental management of batteries.
Title
Providing for responsible environmental management of batteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21b | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21b | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 500 | New Code | See Bill Text |