WA HB1891 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a rangeland fire protection association pilot project.
Title
Concerning a rangeland fire protection association pilot project.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] |
Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-28 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |