WA HB1881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making the custom farming and hauling farm products tax exemptions permanent.
Title
Making the custom farming and hauling farm products tax exemptions permanent.
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] |
Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1881&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1881.pdf |