WA HB1880 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ballot envelopes.
Title
Concerning ballot envelopes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Alexander [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 125, 2010 Laws PV. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-05 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 8. | |
2010-01-15 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-19 | Referred to Rules. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |