WA HB1868 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving worker safety and patient care in health care facilities by addressing staffing needs, overtime, meal and rest breaks, and enforcement.
Title
Improving worker safety and patient care in health care facilities by addressing staffing needs, overtime, meal and rest breaks, and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2022-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5751 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
49 | 12 | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |