WA HB1861 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington future fund trust fund program.
Title
Creating the Washington future fund trust fund program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | HHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5752 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
43 | 79a | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |