WA HB1859 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning quality standards for laboratories conducting cannabis analysis.
Title
Concerning quality standards for laboratories conducting cannabis analysis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022*. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 135, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-28 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5699 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
69 | 50 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |