WA HB1858 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Commerce & Gaming.
Pending: Senate Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Commerce & Gaming.
Pending: Senate Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing marijuana license fees and adding a temporary additional fee on marijuana licenses issued by the Washington state liquor and cannabis board.
Title
Increasing marijuana license fees and adding a temporary additional fee on marijuana licenses issued by the Washington state liquor and cannabis board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-04-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-09 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
Same As/Similar To
SB5130 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017*.