WA HB1855 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Waiving local graduation requirements for certain students.
Title
Waiving local graduation requirements for certain students.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Kevin Parker [R] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2016-01-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-01-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-14 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Education. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2015-06-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9. |
2015-06-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Education |