WA HB1853 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging utility leadership in electric vehicle charging infrastructure build-out.
Title
Encouraging utility leadership in electric vehicle charging infrastructure build-out.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-11 | House | Chapter 220, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Executive session in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive session in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |