WA HB1851 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the care worker research and resource center.
Title
Creating the care worker research and resource center.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1851&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1851.pdf |