WA HB1849 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a work group to study and make recommendations on a monument to honor residents who died in the global war on terror.
Title
Creating a work group to study and make recommendations on a monument to honor residents who died in the global war on terror.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] |
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Dave Paul [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5774 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-11 - First reading, referred to State Government & Elections.