WA HB1848 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning crimes concerning fraud in assisted reproduction.
Title
Concerning crimes concerning fraud in assisted reproduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 94a | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 04 | 080 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 36 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |