WA HB1845 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a body worn camera grant program.
Title
Establishing a body worn camera grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Alicia Rule [D] |
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |