WA HB1840 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving diversity, equity, and mental health at the community and technical colleges.
Title
Improving diversity, equity, and mental health at the community and technical colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |