WA HB1835 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating outreach and completion initiatives to increase postsecondary enrollment.
Title
Creating outreach and completion initiatives to increase postsecondary enrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 214, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2022-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-04 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28b | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28b | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28b | 92 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |