WA HB1833 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning financial reporting by elected and appointed officials, candidates, and appointees.
Title
Concerning financial reporting by elected and appointed officials, candidates, and appointees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |