WA HB1826 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the disclosure of certain information during the discharge planning process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the disclosure of certain information during the discharge planning process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27SenateBH - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-01-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-01-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-01-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-14SenatePlaced on third reading.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-05SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-05SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-02SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-29SenateBH - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-22SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-20HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-31HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback