WA HB1825 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuity of judicial operations in single judge courts.
Title
Concerning continuity of judicial operations in single judge courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Chapter 74, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-21 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 08 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 24 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
2 | 56 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 34 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 34 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 34 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 42 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 50 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 50 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |