WA HB1825 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the timeline for completing a family assessment response, allowing the department of social and health services to complete a family assessment response upon the verbal agreement of a parent to participate, and defining disqualifying crimes.
Title
Extending the timeline for completing a family assessment response, allowing the department of social and health services to complete a family assessment response upon the verbal agreement of a parent to participate, and defining disqualifying crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-14 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |