WA HB1824 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the impacts of pinnipeds on populations of threatened southern resident orca prey.
Title
Addressing the impacts of pinnipeds on populations of threatened southern resident orca prey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-19 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |