WA HB1820 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department of social and health services to request all necessary exemptions and waivers from the federal government to allow students to use electronic benefit transfer cards at institutions of higher education.
Title
Requiring the department of social and health services to request all necessary exemptions and waivers from the federal government to allow students to use electronic benefit transfer cards at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-13 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 11:00 AM. |
2015-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5794 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.