WA HB1807 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: Senate State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: Senate State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing transparency of contributions by creating the Washington state DISCLOSE act of 2017.
Title
Increasing transparency of contributions by creating the Washington state DISCLOSE act of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Same As/Similar To
SB5219 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.