WA HB1798 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning allowed earned release time for certain offenses and enhancements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning allowed earned release time for certain offenses and enhancements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2024-02-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2024-02-03HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2024-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM.
2024-01-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2024-01-18HouseMinority; do not pass.
2024-01-18HouseCSJR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM.
2024-01-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
994a729Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1798&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1798.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1798-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1798-S2.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1798%20HBA%20CSJR%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1798%20HBR%20CSJR%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69588
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70083
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1798%20HBR%20APP%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=71018
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=129016&actionText=CSJR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31627&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=129016&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31828&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback