WA HB1797 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning encouraging affordable housing development and preservation by providing cities limited sales tax remittance for qualifying investments, providing cities and counties authority to use real estate excise taxes to support affordable housing, and providing cities and counties with councilmanic authority to impose the affordable housing sales tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning encouraging affordable housing development and preservation by providing cities limited sales tax remittance for qualifying investments, providing cities and counties authority to use real estate excise taxes to support affordable housing, and providing cities and counties with councilmanic authority to impose the affordable housing sales tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-06-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-06-21HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-05-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-03HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-03-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-03-03HouseFIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
2017-03-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Finance.
2017-02-15HouseCDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback